IA HSB113 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly

Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-13 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 277.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act providing for programs and regulations administered and enforced by the department of agriculture and land stewardship, providing fees, providing for the allocation of moneys, and making penalties applicable.(See HF 277, HF 666.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act providing for programs and regulations administered and enforced by the department of agriculture and land stewardship, providing fees, providing for the allocation of moneys, and making penalties applicable.(See HF 277, HF 666.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-13HouseCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 277.
2023-02-09HouseCommittee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 295.
2023-02-02HouseSubcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0.
2023-02-01HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 02/02/2023 12:00PM RM 304.
2023-01-30HouseSubcommittee: Hora, Ingels and Meyer, B. H.J. 208.
2023-01-30HouseIntroduced, referred to Agriculture. H.J. 206.
2023-01-30HouseBy COMMITTEE ON AGRICULTURE

Same As/Similar To

SSB1115 (Related) 2023-02-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 311.
HF277 (Replaced by) 2023-04-11 - Withdrawn. H.J. 805.
SF311 (Replaced by) 2023-05-02 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1021.
HF666 (Replaced by) 2023-06-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1042.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback