IA SSB1107 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-14 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-14 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing limited immunity from certain criminal offenses and prohibiting certain disciplinary sanctions for persons under twenty-one years of age who report, seek, or require emergency assistance for alcohol overdoses or protection from certain crimes, and modifying penalties.
Title
A bill for an act providing limited immunity from certain criminal offenses and prohibiting certain disciplinary sanctions for persons under twenty-one years of age who report, seek, or require emergency assistance for alcohol overdoses or protection from certain crimes, and modifying penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Subcommittee: Zaun, Nunn, and R. Taylor. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
HSB175 (Related) 2019-03-06 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 421.
SF310 (Replaced by) 2019-02-20 - Subcommittee: Nunn, R. Taylor, and Whiting. S.J. 362.
SF342 (Replaced by) 2020-01-15 - Subcommittee: Zaun, Nunn, and R. Taylor. S.J. 86.
HF684 (Replaced by) 2020-06-25 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 789.
SF310 (Replaced by) 2019-02-20 - Subcommittee: Nunn, R. Taylor, and Whiting. S.J. 362.
SF342 (Replaced by) 2020-01-15 - Subcommittee: Zaun, Nunn, and R. Taylor. S.J. 86.
HF684 (Replaced by) 2020-06-25 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 789.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SSB1107 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SSB1107.html |