IA SF342 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-15 - Subcommittee: Zaun, Nunn, and R. Taylor. S.J. 86.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-15 - Subcommittee: Zaun, Nunn, and R. Taylor. S.J. 86.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing limited immunity from certain criminal offenses and prohibiting certain disciplinary sanctions for persons under twenty-one years of age who report, seek, or require emergency assistance for alcohol overdoses or protection from certain crimes, and modifying penalties. (Formerly SSB 1107.)
Title
A bill for an act providing limited immunity from certain criminal offenses and prohibiting certain disciplinary sanctions for persons under twenty-one years of age who report, seek, or require emergency assistance for alcohol overdoses or protection from certain crimes, and modifying penalties. (Formerly SSB 1107.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-15 | Senate | Subcommittee: Zaun, Nunn, and R. Taylor. S.J. 86. |
2019-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. S.J. 1191. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 857. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 382. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 375. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1107 (Related) 2019-02-14 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HSB175 (Related) 2019-03-06 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 421.
SF310 (Similar To) 2019-02-20 - Subcommittee: Nunn, R. Taylor, and Whiting. S.J. 362.
HF684 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 789.
HSB175 (Related) 2019-03-06 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 421.
SF310 (Similar To) 2019-02-20 - Subcommittee: Nunn, R. Taylor, and Whiting. S.J. 362.
HF684 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 789.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF342 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF342.html |