IA SSB1082 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly

Note: Legislation replaced by SF202
Note: Legislation replaced by HF353

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-24 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Hearing: Mar 1 @ 3:00 pm in Senate Chamber
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to older individuals and dependent adults and creating certain criminal offenses and civil actions, and providing penalties.(See SF 202.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to older individuals and dependent adults and creating certain criminal offenses and civil actions, and providing penalties.(See SF 202.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-24SenateSubcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
2021-02-23SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 02/24/2021 10:00AM RM 111.
2021-01-25SenateSubcommittee: Garrett, Kinney, and Reichman. S.J. 153.
2021-01-25SenateIntroduced, referred to Judiciary.
2021-01-25SenateBy COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY

Same As/Similar To

SF202 (Replaced by) 2021-02-03 - Subcommittee: Whiting, Kinney, and Shipley. S.J. 251.
HF353 (Replaced by) 2021-02-02 - Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 278.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback