IA SF202 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-03 - Subcommittee: Whiting, Kinney, and Shipley. S.J. 251.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to older individuals and dependent adults and creating certain criminal offenses and civil actions, and providing penalties. (See SF 522.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to older individuals and dependent adults and creating certain criminal offenses and civil actions, and providing penalties. (See SF 522.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-03SenateSubcommittee: Whiting, Kinney, and Shipley. S.J. 251.
2021-02-02SenateIntroduced, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 213.

Same As/Similar To

SSB1082 (Related) 2021-03-01 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as [].
HF353 (Similar To) 2021-02-02 - Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 278.
SF522 (Similar To) 2021-03-25 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback