IA SSB1052 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF246
Note: Legislation replaced by HF560
Note: Legislation replaced by HF560
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-07 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-07 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to requirements for eligibility under the all Iowa opportunity scholarship program.
Title
A bill for an act relating to requirements for eligibility under the all Iowa opportunity scholarship program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-07 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Subcommittee: Edler, Quirmbach and Sweeney. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
HSB79 (Related) 2019-02-26 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 364.
SF246 (Replaced by) 2019-04-16 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 981.
HF560 (Replaced by) 2019-04-03 - Withdrawn. H.J. 736.
SF246 (Replaced by) 2019-04-16 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 981.
HF560 (Replaced by) 2019-04-03 - Withdrawn. H.J. 736.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SSB1052 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SSB1052.html |