IA SSB1044 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF264
Note: Legislation replaced by SF330
Note: Legislation replaced by SF330
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-24 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-24 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the division of domestic stock insurers.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the division of domestic stock insurers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-24 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Subcommittee: Sinclair, Chapman and Petersen. |
2019-01-23 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON COMMERCE |
Same As/Similar To
HSB35 (Related) 2019-02-05 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 213.
HF264 (Replaced by) 2019-04-09 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 795.
SF330 (Replaced by) 2019-03-25 - Withdrawn. S.J. 722.
HF264 (Replaced by) 2019-04-09 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 795.
SF330 (Replaced by) 2019-03-25 - Withdrawn. S.J. 722.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SSB1044 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SSB1044.html |