IA HF264 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 795.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 795.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the division of domestic stock insurers. (Formerly HSB 35.) Effective 7-1-19.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the division of domestic stock insurers. (Formerly HSB 35.) Effective 7-1-19.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 795. |
2019-04-08 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 765. |
2019-03-26 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 626. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 723. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 50, nays 0. S.J. 722. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Substituted for SF 330. S.J. 721. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Read first time and attached to companion SF 330. S.J. 370. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 370. |
2019-02-20 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 329. |
2019-02-20 | House | Passed House, yeas 97, nays 1. H.J. 325. |
2019-02-06 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 219. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB35 (Related) 2019-02-05 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 213.
SSB1044 (Related) 2019-01-24 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
SF330 (Similar To) 2019-03-25 - Withdrawn. S.J. 722.
SSB1044 (Related) 2019-01-24 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
SF330 (Similar To) 2019-03-25 - Withdrawn. S.J. 722.