IA SSB1043 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF198
Note: Legislation replaced by HF248
Note: Legislation replaced by HF248
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 198.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 198.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to electric power generating facility emission plans and projects, and including effective date and applicability provisions.(See SF 198.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to electric power generating facility emission plans and projects, and including effective date and applicability provisions.(See SF 198.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-02 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 198. |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/19/2023 3:00PM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Subcommittee: Bousselot, De Witt, and Knox. |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Commerce. |
2023-01-17 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON COMMERCE |
Same As/Similar To
HSB73 (Related) 2023-02-09 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 248.
SF198 (Replaced by) 2023-03-22 - Withdrawn. S.J. 658.
HF248 (Replaced by) 2023-04-28 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 951.
SF198 (Replaced by) 2023-03-22 - Withdrawn. S.J. 658.
HF248 (Replaced by) 2023-04-28 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 951.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SSB1043 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SSB1043.html |