IA HSB73 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF198
Note: Legislation replaced by HF248
Note: Legislation replaced by HF248
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-09 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 248.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-09 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 248.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to electric power generating facility emission plans and projects, and including effective date and applicability provisions.(See HF 248.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to electric power generating facility emission plans and projects, and including effective date and applicability provisions.(See HF 248.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-09 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 248. |
2023-02-07 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 276. |
2023-01-30 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/31/2023 3:45PM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber. |
2023-01-20 | House | Subcommittee: Wills, J., Bloomingdale and Scholten. H.J. 133. |
2023-01-20 | House | Introduced, referred to Commerce. H.J. 132. |
2023-01-20 | House | By COMMITTEE ON COMMERCE |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1043 (Related) 2023-02-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 198.
SF198 (Replaced by) 2023-03-22 - Withdrawn. S.J. 658.
HF248 (Replaced by) 2023-04-28 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 951.
SF198 (Replaced by) 2023-03-22 - Withdrawn. S.J. 658.
HF248 (Replaced by) 2023-04-28 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 951.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HSB73 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HSB73.html |