IA SSB1030 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF362
Note: Legislation replaced by HF724
Note: Legislation replaced by HF724
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 362.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 362.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the treatment of adoptive parent employees and making penalties applicable.(See SF 362.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the treatment of adoptive parent employees and making penalties applicable.(See SF 362.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-11 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 362. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/19/2021 11:00AM 217 Conference Room. |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Subcommittee: Green, Boulton, and Guth. |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Labor and Business Relations. |
2021-01-12 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON LABOR AND BUSINESS RELATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
SF362 (Replaced by) 2021-06-22 - Referred to Labor and Business Relations. S.J. 1148.
HSB218 (Related) 2021-03-03 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 724.
HF724 (Replaced by) 2022-03-24 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 620.
HSB218 (Related) 2021-03-03 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 724.
HF724 (Replaced by) 2022-03-24 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 620.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SSB1030 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SSB1030.html |