IA SSB1016 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly

Note: Legislation replaced by HF295
Note: Legislation replaced by SF240

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 240.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the creation, administration, and termination of custodial trusts.(See SF 240.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the creation, administration, and termination of custodial trusts.(See SF 240.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-02SenateCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 240.
2021-01-20SenateSubcommittee recommends passage.
2021-01-19SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 01/20/2021 10:00AM 217 Conference Room.
2021-01-12SenateSubcommittee: Whiting, Boulton, and Schultz.
2021-01-12SenateIntroduced, referred to Judiciary.
2021-01-12SenateBy COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY

Same As/Similar To

HSB37 (Related) 2021-01-28 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 295.
HF295 (Replaced by) 2021-02-10 - Withdrawn. H.J. 368.
SF240 (Replaced by) 2021-02-15 - Secretary's report on correction in enrollment. S.J. 351.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback