IA HF295 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-10 - Withdrawn. H.J. 368.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-10 - Withdrawn. H.J. 368.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the creation, administration, and termination of custodial trusts.(Formerly HSB 37.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the creation, administration, and termination of custodial trusts.(Formerly HSB 37.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-10 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 368. |
2021-02-10 | House | SF 240 substituted. H.J. 354. |
2021-02-10 | House | Amendment H-1038 adopted. H.J. 354. |
2021-02-09 | House | Amendment H-1038 filed. H.J. 335. |
2021-01-28 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 242. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1016 (Related) 2021-02-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 240.
HSB37 (Related) 2021-01-28 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 295.
SF240 (Similar To) 2021-03-08 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 555.
HSB37 (Related) 2021-01-28 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 295.
SF240 (Similar To) 2021-03-08 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 555.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF295 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF295.html |