IA SSB1009 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly

Note: Legislation replaced by HF366
Note: Legislation replaced by SF239

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 239.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to proper parties in causes of actions following the death of persons entitled or liable to such causes of actions and including applicability provisions.(See SF 239.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to proper parties in causes of actions following the death of persons entitled or liable to such causes of actions and including applicability provisions.(See SF 239.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-02SenateCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 239.
2021-01-28SenateSubcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
2021-01-26SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 01/27/2021 10:00AM RM 111.
2021-01-12SenateSubcommittee: Shipley, Boulton, and Taylor, J.
2021-01-12SenateIntroduced, referred to Judiciary.
2021-01-12SenateBy COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY

Same As/Similar To

HSB35 (Related) 2021-02-02 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 285.
HF366 (Replaced by) 2021-02-16 - Withdrawn. H.J. 437.
SF239 (Replaced by) 2021-02-17 - Message from House. S.J. 364.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback