IA SF239 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-08 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 555.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-08 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 555.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to proper parties in causes of actions following the death of persons entitled or liable to such causes of actions and including applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1009.) Effective date: 07/01/2021. Applicability date: 07/01/2021.
Title
A bill for an act relating to proper parties in causes of actions following the death of persons entitled or liable to such causes of actions and including applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1009.) Effective date: 07/01/2021. Applicability date: 07/01/2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-16 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-08 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 555. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 554. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 364. |
2021-02-16 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 437. |
2021-02-24 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 546. |
2021-02-17 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 466. |
2021-02-16 | House | Passed House, yeas 92, nays none. H.J. 416. |
2021-02-16 | House | Substituted for HF 366. H.J. 415. |
2021-02-09 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 329. |
2021-02-09 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 326. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 291. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0. S.J. 289. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 253. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 247. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1009 (Related) 2021-02-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 239.
HSB35 (Related) 2021-02-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 366.
HF366 (Similar To) 2021-02-16 - Withdrawn. H.J. 437.
HSB35 (Related) 2021-02-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 366.
HF366 (Similar To) 2021-02-16 - Withdrawn. H.J. 437.