IA SJR20 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - Subcommittee: Costello, Dotzler, and Koelker. S.J. 51.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - Subcommittee: Costello, Dotzler, and Koelker. S.J. 51.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A joint resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the State of Iowa relating to the state budget by creating a state general fund expenditure limitation. (Formerly SJR 2.)
Title
A joint resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the State of Iowa relating to the state budget by creating a state general fund expenditure limitation. (Formerly SJR 2.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | Subcommittee: Costello, Dotzler, and Koelker. S.J. 51. |
2019-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations. S.J. 1191. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 455. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. S.J. 447. |
Same As/Similar To
SJR2 (Similar To) 2019-02-05 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SJR20 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SJR20.html |