IA SF631 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on April 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-27 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1174.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-27 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1174.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the administration of the tax and related laws by the department of revenue, including the administration and modification of certain tax credits and refunds, the individual and corporate income taxes, franchise taxes, franchise alternative minimum taxes, moneys and credits taxes, sales and use taxes, and automobile rental excise taxes, the assessment of property owned by certain long distance telephone companies, establishing a taxation and exemption of computers task force, and providing for other properly related matters, making penalties applicable, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1249.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the administration of the tax and related laws by the department of revenue, including the administration and modification of certain tax credits and refunds, the individual and corporate income taxes, franchise taxes, franchise alternative minimum taxes, moneys and credits taxes, sales and use taxes, and automobile rental excise taxes, the assessment of property owned by certain long distance telephone companies, establishing a taxation and exemption of computers task force, and providing for other properly related matters, making penalties applicable, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1249.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-27 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 1174. |
2019-04-27 | Senate | HF 779 substituted. S.J. 1172. |
2019-04-27 | Senate | Amendment S-3256 adopted. S.J. 1172. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Amendment S-3256 filed. S.J. 1165. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Attached to similar HF 779. S.J. 1145. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 1011. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 1008. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1249 (Related) 2019-04-16 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF631 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF631.html |