IA SF576 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-09 - Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 922.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-09 - Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 922.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act authorizing future tax contingencies, reducing the state inheritance tax rates and providing for the future repeal of the state inheritance tax and state qualified use inheritance tax, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions.(Formerly SSB 1250.)
Title
A bill for an act authorizing future tax contingencies, reducing the state inheritance tax rates and providing for the future repeal of the state inheritance tax and state qualified use inheritance tax, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions.(Formerly SSB 1250.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-17 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Ways And Means Report (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Ways And Means Report (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-09 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 922. |
2021-04-05 | House | Fiscal note. |
2021-03-17 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 743. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 618. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 46, nays 0. S.J. 614. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 593. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 590. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1250 (Related) 2021-03-10 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 576.