IA SF560 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Withdrawn. S.J. 626.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Withdrawn. S.J. 626.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act related to installations of certain wireless telecommunications infrastructure in the state, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1195.)
Title
A bill for an act related to installations of certain wireless telecommunications infrastructure in the state, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1195.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 626. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | HF 487 substituted. S.J. 625. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Attached to companion HF 487. S.J. 573. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 523. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 517. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB155 (Related) 2019-02-19 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 315.
HF487 (Similar To) 2019-03-25 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 623.
SSB1195 (Related) 2019-03-05 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF487 (Similar To) 2019-03-25 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 623.
SSB1195 (Related) 2019-03-05 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF560 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF560.html |