IA HF487 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 623.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 623.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act related to installations of certain wireless telecommunications infrastructure in the state, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 155.) Effective 3-25-19.
Title
A bill for an act related to installations of certain wireless telecommunications infrastructure in the state, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 155.) Effective 3-25-19.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 38 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - Passed House (Y: 74 N: 20 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 38 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 74 N: 20 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - Passed House (Y: 74 N: 20 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 38 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 74 N: 20 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 623. |
2019-03-25 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 622. |
2019-03-14 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 562. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 626. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 38, nays 10. S.J. 626. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Substituted for SF 560. S.J. 625. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Read first time and attached to companion SF 560. S.J. 573. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 573. |
2019-03-11 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 496. |
2019-03-11 | House | Passed House, yeas 74, nays 20. H.J. 488. |
2019-02-21 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 339. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB155 (Related) 2019-02-19 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 315.
SSB1195 (Related) 2019-03-05 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF560 (Similar To) 2019-03-14 - Withdrawn. S.J. 626.
SSB1195 (Related) 2019-03-05 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF560 (Similar To) 2019-03-14 - Withdrawn. S.J. 626.