IA HSB155 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF487
Note: Legislation replaced by SF560
Note: Legislation replaced by SF560
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-19 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 315.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-19 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 315.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act related to installations of certain wireless telecommunications infrastructure in the state, and including effective date provisions.
Title
A bill for an act related to installations of certain wireless telecommunications infrastructure in the state, and including effective date provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 315. |
2019-02-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2019-02-13 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/14/2019 12:30PM House Lounge. |
2019-02-12 | House | Subcommittee: Jeneary, Worthan and Kacena. H.J. 260. |
2019-02-12 | House | By COMMITTEE ON PUBLIC SAFETY |
Same As/Similar To
HF487 (Replaced by) 2019-03-25 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 623.
SSB1195 (Related) 2019-03-05 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF560 (Replaced by) 2019-03-14 - Withdrawn. S.J. 626.
SSB1195 (Related) 2019-03-05 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF560 (Replaced by) 2019-03-14 - Withdrawn. S.J. 626.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HSB155 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HSB155.html |