IA SF551 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 15 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-09 - Subcommittee: Dawson, Koelker, and Winckler. S.J. 60.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-09 - Subcommittee: Dawson, Koelker, and Winckler. S.J. 60.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to decoupling federal additional first-year depreciation for Iowa tax purposes, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions.(Formerly SSB 1127.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to decoupling federal additional first-year depreciation for Iowa tax purposes, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions.(Formerly SSB 1127.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-15 - Senate - Senate Ways And Means Report (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Ways And Means Report (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Ways And Means Report (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-09 | Senate | Subcommittee: Dawson, Koelker, and Winckler. S.J. 60. |
2023-12-31 | Senate | END OF [] ACTIONS |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 1092. |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 723. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 591. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 590. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1127 (Related) 2023-03-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 551.