IA SF546 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-08 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to private instruction and driver education. (Formerly SSB 1219.) Effective date: 07/01/2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to private instruction and driver education. (Formerly SSB 1219.) Effective date: 07/01/2021.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-28 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 33 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3181 to House amendment S–3146 be adopted? (Y: 19 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-04-12 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 59 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 28 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3058 be adopted?’ (Y: 20 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Education Report (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-08HouseFiscal note.
2021-05-10HouseSigned by Governor. S.J. 1054.
2021-05-10HouseReported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 1050.
2021-04-28HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 1023.
2021-04-28SenateImmediate message. S.J. 992.
2021-04-28SenatePassed Senate, yeas 33, nays 15. S.J. 991.
2021-04-28SenateSenate concurred with S-3146. S.J. 990.
2021-04-28SenateAmendment S-3181 to S-3146 filed, lost. S.J. 989.
2021-04-28SenateDeferred. S.J. 968.
2021-04-20SenateFiscal note.
2021-04-13SenateMessage from House, with amendment S-3146. S.J. 856.
2021-04-12HouseImmediate message. H.J. 936.
2021-05-18HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 1173.
2021-04-22HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 1000.
2021-04-21HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 996.
2021-04-14HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 962.
2021-04-12HousePassed House, yeas 59 nays 34. H.J. 935.
2021-04-12HouseAmendment H-1372 adopted. H.J. 934.
2021-04-08HouseAmendment H-1372 filed. H.J. 921.
2021-04-08HousePlaced on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 920.
2021-03-31HouseCommittee report, recommending passage. H.J. 874.
2021-03-17HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 03/18/2021 8:30AM House Lounge 1.
2021-03-16HouseSubcommittee: Fry, Steckman and Stone. H.J. 738.
2021-03-10HouseRead first time, referred to Education. H.J. 684.
2021-03-09HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 650.
2021-03-09SenateImmediate message. S.J. 568.
2021-03-09SenatePassed Senate, yeas 28, nays 17. S.J. 568.
2021-03-09SenateAmendment S-3058 filed, lost. S.J. 567.
2021-03-04SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 523.
2021-03-04SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 518.

Same As/Similar To

SSB1219 (Related) 2021-03-03 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 546.

Iowa State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SF546
Texthttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SF546.html
Texthttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGE/89/attachments/SF546.html
Supplementhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/FN/1219264.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/FN/1220327.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/SJNL/20210304_SJNL.pdf#524
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/SJNL/20210309_SJNL.pdf#567
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/SJNL/20210309_SJNL.pdf#568
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/HJNL/20210412_HJNL.pdf#935
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/SJNL/20210428_SJNL.pdf#990
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/SJNL/20210428_SJNL.pdf#991

Bill Comments 750

feedback