IA SSB1219 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF546
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-03 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 546.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-03 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 546.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to private instruction and driver education provided by a teaching parent.(See SF 546.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to private instruction and driver education provided by a teaching parent.(See SF 546.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-03 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 546. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/25/2021 12:30PM RM 24A. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Subcommittee: Johnson, Smith, J., and Taylor, J. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Education. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
SF546 (Replaced by) 2021-06-08 - Fiscal note.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SSB1219 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SSB1219.html |