IA SF536 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-04-19 - Withdrawn. S.J. 869.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to real estate licensee liability.(Formerly SSB 1172.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to real estate licensee liability.(Formerly SSB 1172.)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-06 - Senate - Senate Commerce Report (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce Report (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-19SenateWithdrawn. S.J. 869.
2023-04-19SenateHF 607 substituted. S.J. 868.
2023-03-30SenatePlaced on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 722.
2023-03-13SenateAttached to HF 607. S.J. 553.
2023-03-06SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 500.
2023-03-06SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 495.

Same As/Similar To

SSB1172 (Related) 2023-03-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 536.
HSB204 (Related) 2023-03-03 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 607.
HF607 (Similar To) 2023-05-03 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1015.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback