IA SF503 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1137.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1137.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing for the deferral of unpaid installments and deferral charges for certain interest-bearing consumer credit transactions. (Formerly SSB 1016 and SF 177.) Effective 7-1-17.
Title
A bill for an act providing for the deferral of unpaid installments and deferral charges for certain interest-bearing consumer credit transactions. (Formerly SSB 1016 and SF 177.) Effective 7-1-17.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-17 - House - Passed House (Y: 95 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - Passed House (Y: 95 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - Passed House (Y: 95 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 1137. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Sent to Governor. S.J. 1134. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 1134. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 1044. |
2017-04-17 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 1035. |
2017-04-17 | House | Passed House, ayes 95, nays 4. H.J. 1030. |
2017-04-17 | House | Substituted for HF 629. H.J. 1029. |
2017-04-13 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 1002. |
2017-04-13 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 1001. |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 984. |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays none. S.J. 984. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 932. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 931. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB14 (Related) 2017-02-22 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 453.
SSB1016 (Related) 2017-01-25 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
SF177 (Similar To) 2017-04-03 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HF512 (Similar To) 2017-04-17 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1035.
HF629 (Similar To) 2017-04-17 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1035.
SSB1016 (Related) 2017-01-25 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
SF177 (Similar To) 2017-04-03 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HF512 (Similar To) 2017-04-17 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1035.
HF629 (Similar To) 2017-04-17 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1035.