IA SF177 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-03 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act providing for the deferral of unpaid installments and deferral charges for certain interest-bearing consumer credit transactions. (Formerly SSB 1016; See SF 503.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act providing for the deferral of unpaid installments and deferral charges for certain interest-bearing consumer credit transactions. (Formerly SSB 1016; See SF 503.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-03SenateSubcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
2017-03-21SenateSubcommittee: Anderson, Breitbach, and Dotzler. S.J. 719.
2017-03-16SenateReferred to Ways and Means. S.J. 649.
2017-03-15SenateAmendment S-3159 filed. S.J. 646.
2017-02-01SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 203.
2017-02-01SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 201.

Same As/Similar To

HSB14 (Related) 2017-02-22 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 453.
SSB1016 (Related) 2017-01-25 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HF512 (Similar To) 2017-04-17 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1035.
HF629 (Similar To) 2017-04-17 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1035.
SF503 (Similar To) 2017-05-11 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1137.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback