IA HF512 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-17 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1035.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-17 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1035.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing for the deferral of unpaid installments and deferral charges for certain interest-bearing consumer credit transactions. (Formerly HSB 14)(See HF 629.)
Title
A bill for an act providing for the deferral of unpaid installments and deferral charges for certain interest-bearing consumer credit transactions. (Formerly HSB 14)(See HF 629.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-17 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 1035. |
2017-04-03 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 848. |
2017-03-08 | House | Amendment H-1165 filed. H.J. 565. |
2017-03-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2017-03-07 | House | Subcommittee: Bloomingdale, McConkey and Kaufmann. H.J. 543. |
2017-03-03 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 509. |
2017-03-02 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 503. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB14 (Related) 2017-02-22 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 453.
SSB1016 (Related) 2017-01-25 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
SF177 (Similar To) 2017-04-03 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HF629 (Similar To) 2017-04-17 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1035.
SF503 (Similar To) 2017-05-11 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1137.
SSB1016 (Related) 2017-01-25 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
SF177 (Similar To) 2017-04-03 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HF629 (Similar To) 2017-04-17 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1035.
SF503 (Similar To) 2017-05-11 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1137.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HF512 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/HouseFiles/Introduced/HF512.html |