IA SF484 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-04 - Rereferred to Education. H.J. 1030.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-04 - Rereferred to Education. H.J. 1030.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to meetings of the school finance formula review committee.(Formerly SF 393.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to meetings of the school finance formula review committee.(Formerly SF 393.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-22 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate Education Report (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Report (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate Education Report (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Education Report (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-04 | House | Rereferred to Education. H.J. 1030. |
2023-04-06 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 776. |
2023-03-30 | House | Placed on calendar. H.J. 748. |
2023-03-30 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 748. |
2023-03-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. |
2023-03-27 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/29/2023 8:15AM House Lounge. |
2023-03-27 | House | Subcommittee: Gehlbach, Gustoff and Madison. H.J. 735. |
2023-03-23 | House | Read first time, referred to Education. H.J. 730. |
2023-03-23 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 729. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 660. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 50, nays 0. S.J. 659. |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 466. |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 459. |
Same As/Similar To
SF393 (Similar To) 2023-03-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 484. S.J. 466.