IA SF484 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-22 - Withdrawn. S.J. 659.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-22 - Withdrawn. S.J. 659.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to financial assistance provided by the economic development authority to certain apprenticeship sponsors and lead apprenticeship sponsors, and including applicability provisions.(Formerly SSB 1173.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to financial assistance provided by the economic development authority to certain apprenticeship sponsors and lead apprenticeship sponsors, and including applicability provisions.(Formerly SSB 1173.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate Labor And Business Relations Report (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-22 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 659. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | HF 559 substituted. S.J. 658. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Attached to companion HF 559. S.J. 490. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 487. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 479. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1173 (Related) 2021-03-01 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 484.
HSB202 (Related) 2021-02-16 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 559.
HF559 (Similar To) 2021-04-12 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 937.
HSB202 (Related) 2021-02-16 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 559.
HF559 (Similar To) 2021-04-12 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 937.