IA HF559 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 937.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 937.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to financial assistance provided by the economic development authority to certain apprenticeship sponsors and lead apprenticeship sponsors, and including applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 202.) Effective date: 07/01/2021. Applicability date: 07/01/2021.
Title
A bill for an act relating to financial assistance provided by the economic development authority to certain apprenticeship sponsors and lead apprenticeship sponsors, and including applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 202.) Effective date: 07/01/2021. Applicability date: 07/01/2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-22 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 937. |
2021-04-12 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 936. |
2021-03-23 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 765. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 659. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0. S.J. 658. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Substituted for SF 484. S.J. 658. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Attached to companion SF 484. S.J. 490. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Read first time, passed on file. S.J. 451. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 451. |
2021-02-23 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 529. |
2021-05-19 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1204. |
2021-02-24 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 546. |
2021-02-23 | House | Passed House, yeas 93, nays none. H.J. 525. |
2021-02-16 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 403. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1173 (Related) 2021-03-01 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 484.
HSB202 (Related) 2021-02-16 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 559.
SF484 (Similar To) 2021-03-22 - Withdrawn. S.J. 659.
HSB202 (Related) 2021-02-16 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 559.
SF484 (Similar To) 2021-03-22 - Withdrawn. S.J. 659.