IA SF484 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-27 - Amendments H-8300 and H-8302 filed. H.J. 775.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-27 - Amendments H-8300 and H-8302 filed. H.J. 775.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the medical cannabis Act and providing for civil and criminal penalties and fees. (Formerly SSB 1243.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the medical cannabis Act and providing for civil and criminal penalties and fees. (Formerly SSB 1243.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-15 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 26 N: 19 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-27 | House | Amendments H-8300 and H-8302 filed. H.J. 775. |
2016-04-27 | House | Motion failed. H.J. 765. |
2016-04-27 | House | Motion to invoke Rule 60, withdraw from committee and place on calendar. H.J. 764. |
2015-05-05 | House | Fiscal note. HCS. |
2015-04-15 | House | Read first time, referred to Public Safety. H.J. 864. |
2015-04-15 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 847. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 875. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 26, nays 19. S.J. 874. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Amendment S-3122 adopted. S.J. 874. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Amendment S-3123 adopted. S.J. 873. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Amendment S-3126 filed, lost. S.J. 872. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Amendment S-3123 filed. S.J. 865. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Amendment S-3122 filed. S.J. 865. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Fiscal note. SCS. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 768. |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 741. |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 739. |