IA SF478 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1087.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1087.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the operation of state government, including the commencement of audits, information made available to the auditor of state, and disputes between governmental agencies. (Formerly SSB 1200.) Effective date: 07/01/2023.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the operation of state government, including the commencement of audits, information made available to the auditor of state, and disputes between governmental agencies. (Formerly SSB 1200.) Effective date: 07/01/2023.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-26 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3193 to House amendment S–3172 be adopted? (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3193 to House amendment S–3172 be adopted? (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - House - Shall the rules be suspended to consider amendment H–1278, to the committee amendment H–1177? (Y: 35 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2023-04-20 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 55 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - House - Shall amendment H–1277, to the committee amendment H–1177, be adopted? (Y: 35 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2023-04-20 - House - Shall amendment H–1276, to the committee amendment H–1177, be adopted? (Y: 36 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2023-03-07 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3063 to amendment S–3057 be adopted? (Y: 16 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-03-07 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3063 to amendment S–3057 be adopted? (Y: 16 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Shall amendment S–3193 to House amendment S–3172 be adopted? (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Shall amendment S–3063 to amendment S–3057 be adopted? (Y: 16 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Shall amendment S–3193 to House amendment S–3172 be adopted? (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Shall amendment S–3063 to amendment S–3057 be adopted? (Y: 16 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
Senate - Senate State Government Report (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3193 to House amendment S–3172 be adopted? (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3193 to House amendment S–3172 be adopted? (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - House - Shall the rules be suspended to consider amendment H–1278, to the committee amendment H–1177? (Y: 35 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2023-04-20 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 55 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - House - Shall amendment H–1277, to the committee amendment H–1177, be adopted? (Y: 35 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2023-04-20 - House - Shall amendment H–1276, to the committee amendment H–1177, be adopted? (Y: 36 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2023-03-07 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3063 to amendment S–3057 be adopted? (Y: 16 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-03-07 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3063 to amendment S–3057 be adopted? (Y: 16 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Shall amendment S–3193 to House amendment S–3172 be adopted? (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Shall amendment S–3063 to amendment S–3057 be adopted? (Y: 16 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Shall amendment S–3193 to House amendment S–3172 be adopted? (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Shall amendment S–3063 to amendment S–3057 be adopted? (Y: 16 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
Senate - Senate State Government Report (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 1087. |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 1086. |
2023-04-27 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 915. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 984. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 33, nays 16. S.J. 983. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Senate concurred with S-3172. S.J. 983. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Amendment S-3193 filed, lost. S.J. 982. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-3172. S.J. 922. |
2023-04-20 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 901. |
2023-05-02 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 977. |
2023-04-20 | House | Passed House, yeas 55, nays 41. H.J. 897. |
2023-04-20 | House | Amendment H-1177 adopted, as amended. H.J. 897. |
2023-04-20 | House | Amendment H-1277 to amendment H-1177, yeas 35, nays 61, filed, lost. H.J. 896. |
2023-04-20 | House | Amendment H-1276 to amendment H-1177, yeas 36, nays 60, filed, lost. H.J. 896. |
2023-04-20 | House | Amendment H-1275 to amendment H-1177, filed, adopted. H.J. 895. |
2023-04-20 | House | Motion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 895. |
2023-04-20 | House | Motion to suspend rules for immediate consideration of amendment H-1278 to amendment H-1177, yeas 35, nays 61. H.J. 894. |
2023-04-20 | House | Point of order raised on amendment H-1278 to amendment H-1177, ruled not germane. H.J. 894. |
2023-04-20 | House | Amendment H-1278 filed. H.J. 894. |
2023-04-06 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 776. |
2023-04-03 | House | Placed on calendar. H.J. 757. |
2023-04-03 | House | Committee amendment H-1177 filed. H.J. 757. |
2023-03-31 | House | Fiscal note. |
2023-03-30 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 757. |
2023-03-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1. |
2023-03-28 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/29/2023 12:00PM House Lounge 2. |
2023-03-22 | House | Subcommittee: Kaufmann, Bergan and Nielsen. H.J. 727. |
2023-03-08 | House | Read first time, referred to State Government. H.J. 559. |
2023-03-08 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 543. |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 536. |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 33, nays 16. S.J. 536. |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Amendment S-3057 adopted. S.J. 535. |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Amendment S-3063 filed, lost. S.J. 535. |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Deferred. S.J. 520. |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Point of order raised on S-3057, ruled in order. S.J. 520. |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Amendment S-3057 filed. S.J. 519. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 454. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 449. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1200 (Related) 2023-03-01 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 478.