IA SF470 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-29 - Subcommittee Meeting: 03/31/2021 12:00PM RM 24A.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-29 - Subcommittee Meeting: 03/31/2021 12:00PM RM 24A.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the redemption of and payment of refund value on beverage containers, making appropriations, providing penalties, and including effective date provisions.(Formerly SF 368.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the redemption of and payment of refund value on beverage containers, making appropriations, providing penalties, and including effective date provisions.(Formerly SF 368.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources And Environment Report (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/31/2021 12:00PM RM 24A. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Subcommittee: Dawson, Goodwin, and Jochum. S.J. 497. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 477. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 474. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 466. |
Same As/Similar To
SF368 (Similar To) 2021-02-25 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 470. S.J. 474.