IA SF470 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-22 - Referred to Human Resources. S.J. 1134.
Pending: Senate Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-22 - Referred to Human Resources. S.J. 1134.
Pending: Senate Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the medical use of cannabidiol including the scheduling of a cannabidiol investigational product approved as a prescription drug medication under federal law and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SF 282.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the medical use of cannabidiol including the scheduling of a cannabidiol investigational product approved as a prescription drug medication under federal law and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SF 282.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Human Resources. S.J. 1134. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 838. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 510. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 504. |
Same As/Similar To
SF282 (Similar To) 2017-03-02 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HSB164 (Related) 2018-02-06 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF520 (Similar To) 2018-01-16 - Subcommittee: Klein, Anderson and Hager. H.J. 104.
HSB164 (Related) 2018-02-06 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF520 (Similar To) 2018-01-16 - Subcommittee: Klein, Anderson and Hager. H.J. 104.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SF470 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/SenateFiles/Introduced/SF470.html |