IA HSB164 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-06 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-06 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the medical use of cannabidiol including the rescheduling of a cannabidiol investigational product approved as a prescription drug medication under federal law and including effective date provisions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the medical use of cannabidiol including the rescheduling of a cannabidiol investigational product approved as a prescription drug medication under federal law and including effective date provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2017-03-01 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 494. |
2017-02-27 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/28/2017 11:30AM RM 102, Sup. Ct. Consult |
2017-02-23 | House | Subcommittee: Klein, Hager and Kressig. H.J. 463. |
2017-02-23 | House | By COMMITTEE ON PUBLIC SAFETY |
Same As/Similar To
SF282 (Replaced by) 2017-03-02 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF520 (Replaced by) 2018-01-16 - Subcommittee: Klein, Anderson and Hager. H.J. 104.
SF470 (Replaced by) 2017-04-22 - Referred to Human Resources. S.J. 1134.
HF520 (Replaced by) 2018-01-16 - Subcommittee: Klein, Anderson and Hager. H.J. 104.
SF470 (Replaced by) 2017-04-22 - Referred to Human Resources. S.J. 1134.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HSB164 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/HSB164.html |