IA HF520 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-22 - Sponsor added, Gaskill. H.J. 1141.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the medical use of cannabidiol including the scheduling of a cannabidiol investigational product approved as a prescription drug medication under federal law and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 164.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the medical use of cannabidiol including the scheduling of a cannabidiol investigational product approved as a prescription drug medication under federal law and including effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 164.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-22HouseSponsor added, Gaskill. H.J. 1141.
2017-04-21HouseSponsors added, Breckenridge, Isenhart, Jacoby, Kacena, Kurth, Lensing, McConkey, Nielsen, R. Smith, Staed, Thede, Winckler, Wessel-Kroeschell and Wolfe. H.J. 1141.
2017-04-20HouseAmendment H-1423 filed. H.J. 1117.
2017-04-20HouseAmendment H-1420 filed. H.J. 1116.
2017-03-30HousePlaced on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 818.
2017-03-07HouseAmendment H-1162 filed. H.J. 544.
2017-03-03HouseIntroduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 508.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback