IA SF461 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-20 - Rereferred to Human Resources. H.J. 1203.
Pending: House Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-20 - Rereferred to Human Resources. H.J. 1203.
Pending: House Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the voting members of a governing board of a mental health and disability services region.(Formerly SSB 1158.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the voting members of a governing board of a mental health and disability services region.(Formerly SSB 1158.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-09 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate Human Resources Report (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate Human Resources Report (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | House | Rereferred to Human Resources. H.J. 1203. |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 920. |
2021-04-01 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 878. |
2021-03-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2021-03-17 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/22/2021 12:30PM House Lounge 1. |
2021-03-15 | House | Subcommittee: Moore, T., Bennett and Meyer, A.. H.J. 730. |
2021-03-10 | House | Read first time, referred to Human Resources. H.J. 683. |
2021-03-09 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 650. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 560. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 47, nays 0. S.J. 557. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 472. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 464. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1158 (Related) 2021-02-24 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 461.