IA SF457 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-23 - Withdrawn. S.J. 747.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-23 - Withdrawn. S.J. 747.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to stroke care quality improvement. (Formerly SSB 1147.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to stroke care quality improvement. (Formerly SSB 1147.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-23 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 747. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | HF 548 substituted. S.J. 746. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Amendment S-3223 adopted. S.J. 745. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Amendment S-3223 filed. S.J. 737. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Attached to similar HF 548. S.J. 736. |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 479. |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 476. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1147 (Related) 2017-02-28 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SF457 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/SenateFiles/Introduced/SF457.html |