IA SF439 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-12-31 - END OF 2013 ACTIONS
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-12-31 - END OF 2013 ACTIONS
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to charitable food donations to food banks and similar organizations, including by providing for appropriations and a tax credit, and including applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1177, SF 367, and SF 437.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to charitable food donations to food banks and similar organizations, including by providing for appropriations and a tax credit, and including applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1177, SF 367, and SF 437.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-31 | House | END OF 2013 ACTIONS |
2013-04-24 | House | Subcommittee, Windschitl, Oldson, and Sands. H.J. 938. |
2013-04-16 | House | Read first time, referred to Ways & Means. H.J. 859. |
2013-04-16 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 855. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 853. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 34, nays 15. S.J. 853. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Deferred. S.J. 847. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Amendment S-3151 lost. S.J. 847. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Amendment S-3151 filed. S.J. 840. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Fiscal note. SCS. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 809. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. S.J. 808. |