IA SF427 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 519. S.J. 507.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 519. S.J. 507.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to electronic registration renewal of off-road utility vehicles.(See SF 519.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to electronic registration renewal of off-road utility vehicles.(See SF 519.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-06 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 519. S.J. 507. |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/28/2023 12:30PM Room 315. |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Subcommittee: De Witt, Bennett, and Evans. S.J. 425. |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Natural Resources and Environment. S.J. 421. |
Same As/Similar To
SF519 (Similar To) 2023-05-03 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1065.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SF427 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SF427.html |