IA SF425 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-10 - Withdrawn. S.J. 921.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-10 - Withdrawn. S.J. 921.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing for juvenile court jurisdiction over minor guardianship proceedings and including effective date and applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1091.)
Title
A bill for an act providing for juvenile court jurisdiction over minor guardianship proceedings and including effective date and applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1091.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 921. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | HF 591 substituted. S.J. 920. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Amendment S-3146 adopted. S.J. 919. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Amendment S-3146 filed. S.J. 909. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 858. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Attached to similar HF 591. S.J. 714. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 437. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 427. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1091 (Related) 2019-02-21 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HSB118 (Related) 2019-02-26 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 365.
HF591 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1081.
HSB118 (Related) 2019-02-26 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 365.
HF591 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1081.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF425 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF425.html |