IA HF591 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act providing for juvenile court jurisdiction over minor guardianship proceedings and including effective date and applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 118.) Effective 1-1-20.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act providing for juvenile court jurisdiction over minor guardianship proceedings and including effective date and applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 118.) Effective 1-1-20.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01SenateSigned by Governor.
2019-04-29SenateReported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
2019-04-16SenateMessage from House. S.J. 965.
2019-04-15HouseImmediate message. H.J. 858.
2019-04-17HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 899.
2019-04-15HousePassed House, yeas 97 nays none. H.J. 859.
2019-04-15HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendment H-1195. H.J. 855.
2019-04-10HouseSenate amendment H-1195 filed. H.J. 811.
2019-04-10HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 809.
2019-04-10SenateImmediate message. S.J. 921.
2019-04-10SenatePassed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 920.
2019-04-10SenateAmendment S-3149 filed, adopted. S.J. 920.
2019-04-04SenatePlaced on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 858.
2019-03-25SenateRead first time and attached to similar SF 425. S.J. 714.
2019-03-25SenateMessage from House. S.J. 714.
2019-03-21HouseImmediate message. H.J. 616.
2019-03-25HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 622.
2019-03-21HousePassed House, yeas 97, nays none. H.J. 614.
2019-03-21HouseAmendment H-1054 adopted. H.J. 614.
2019-03-19HouseAmendment H-1054 filed. H.J. 586.
2019-03-13HouseFiscal note.
2019-03-04HouseIntroduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 388.

Same As/Similar To

SSB1091 (Related) 2019-02-21 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HSB118 (Related) 2019-02-26 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 365.
SF425 (Similar To) 2019-04-10 - Withdrawn. S.J. 921.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback