IA SF411 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-21 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1125.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-21 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1125.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to contractor registration and licensing by the department of public health and the department of workforce development and related fees and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1113.) Effective 4-21-17.
Title
A bill for an act relating to contractor registration and licensing by the department of public health and the department of workforce development and related fees and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1113.) Effective 4-21-17.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-11 - House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-21 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 1125. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Sent to Governor. S.J. 1061. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 1061. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 969. |
2017-04-11 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 977. |
2017-04-11 | House | Passed House, ayes 97, nays 0. H.J. 974. |
2017-04-06 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 905. |
2017-03-30 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 822. |
2017-03-16 | House | Subcommittee: Koester, Bergan and Hunter. H.J. 678. |
2017-03-15 | House | Read first time, referred to State Government. H.J. 646. |
2017-03-14 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 637. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 592. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays 0. S.J. 590. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 465. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 453. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1113 (Related) 2017-02-22 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HSB161 (Related) 2017-02-23 - Subcommittee: Koester, Bergan and Hunter.
HSB161 (Related) 2017-02-23 - Subcommittee: Koester, Bergan and Hunter.