IA SF410 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-19 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-19 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the removal, transfer, and transportation of human remains by an unlicensed employee or agent of a funeral director.(Formerly SF 107.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the removal, transfer, and transportation of human remains by an unlicensed employee or agent of a funeral director.(Formerly SF 107.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate State Government Report (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-19 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/19/2022 3:30PM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Subcommittee: Dawson, Bisignano, and Schultz. S.J. 109. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Referred to State Government. S.J. 726. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 406. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 402. |
Same As/Similar To
SF107 (Similar To) 2022-01-12 - Subcommittee reassigned: Dawson, Bisignano, and Schultz. S.J. 79.