IA SF404 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1135.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1135.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the use of experimental treatments for patients with a terminal illness. (Formerly SSB 1115.) Effective 7-1-17.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the use of experimental treatments for patients with a terminal illness. (Formerly SSB 1115.) Effective 7-1-17.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-17 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | House | Signed by Governor. S.J. 1135. |
2017-04-25 | House | Sent to Governor. S.J. 1134. |
2017-04-25 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 1134. |
2017-04-17 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 1024. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1029. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays 0. S.J. 1027. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Senate concurred with S-3303. S.J. 1026. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-3303. S.J. 954. |
2017-04-10 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 960. |
2017-04-11 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 981. |
2017-04-10 | House | Passed House, ayes 96, nays 0. H.J. 932. |
2017-04-10 | House | Amendment H-1258 adopted. H.J. 932. |
2017-04-06 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 905. |
2017-04-03 | House | Amendment H-1258 filed. H.J. 849. |
2017-03-27 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 788. |
2017-03-16 | House | Subcommittee: Salmon, Brown-Powers and Moore. H.J. 678. |
2017-03-15 | House | Read first time, referred to Human Resources. H.J. 646. |
2017-03-14 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 636. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 590. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays 0. S.J. 589. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 446. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 445. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1115 (Related) 2017-02-22 - Subcommittee recommends passage.