IA SSB1115 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF404
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-22 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-22 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the use of experimental treatments for patients with a terminal illness.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the use of experimental treatments for patients with a terminal illness.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-22 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/22/2017 1:30PM Rm. 206 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/22/2017 1:00PM Rm. 206 (Cancelled) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Subcommittee: Bertrand, Anderson, and Petersen. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON COMMERCE |
Same As/Similar To
SF404 (Replaced by) 2017-05-11 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1135.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SSB1115 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/SSB1115.html |