IA SF384 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-23 - Withdrawn. S.J. 745.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-23 - Withdrawn. S.J. 745.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to nonsubstantive Code corrections. (Formerly SSB 1131.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to nonsubstantive Code corrections. (Formerly SSB 1131.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-23 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 745. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | HF 488 substituted. S.J. 743. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Amendment S-3081 adopted. S.J. 743. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Attached to companion HF 488. S.J. 586. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Amendment S-3081 filed. S.J. 434. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. S.J. 434. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 431. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB128 (Related) 2017-02-28 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 486.
SSB1131 (Related) 2017-02-22 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF488 (Similar To) 2017-04-12 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1008.
SSB1131 (Related) 2017-02-22 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF488 (Similar To) 2017-04-12 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1008.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SF384 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/SenateFiles/Introduced/SF384.html |