IA HSB128 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF384
Note: Legislation replaced by HF488
Note: Legislation replaced by HF488
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-28 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 486.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-28 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 486.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to nonsubstantive Code corrections.
Title
A bill for an act relating to nonsubstantive Code corrections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-28 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 486. |
2017-02-20 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/21/2017 4:00PM House Lounge |
2017-02-20 | House | Subcommittee: Paustian, Hein and R. Smith. H.J. 417. |
2017-02-20 | House | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
SF384 (Replaced by) 2017-03-23 - Withdrawn. S.J. 745.
HF488 (Replaced by) 2017-04-12 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1008.
SSB1131 (Related) 2017-02-22 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF488 (Replaced by) 2017-04-12 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1008.
SSB1131 (Related) 2017-02-22 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HSB128 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/HSB128.html |