IA HF488 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-12 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1008.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-12 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1008.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to nonsubstantive Code corrections. (Formerly HSB 128.) Effective 7-1-17.
Title
A bill for an act relating to nonsubstantive Code corrections. (Formerly HSB 128.) Effective 7-1-17.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-23 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - Passed House (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - Passed House (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - Passed House (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - Passed House (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-12 | House | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1008. |
2017-04-11 | House | Sent to Governor. H.J. 981. |
2017-04-11 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 981. |
2017-03-23 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 761. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 746. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Explanation of vote. S.J. 788. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 47, nays none. S.J. 743. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Substituted for SF 384. S.J. 743. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Read first time and attached to companion SF 384. S.J. 586. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 586. |
2017-03-13 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 624. |
2017-03-13 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 755. |
2017-03-13 | House | Passed House, ayes 95, nays 0. H.J. 620. |
2017-03-13 | House | Committee amendment H-1129 adopted. H.J. 619. |
2017-03-06 | House | Committee amendment H-1129 filed. H.J. 517. |
2017-03-01 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 489. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB128 (Related) 2017-02-28 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 486.
SSB1131 (Related) 2017-02-22 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF384 (Similar To) 2017-03-23 - Withdrawn. S.J. 745.
SSB1131 (Related) 2017-02-22 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF384 (Similar To) 2017-03-23 - Withdrawn. S.J. 745.